Global Patent Index - EP 1001491 A2

EP 1001491 A2 2000-05-17 - A connector

Title (en)

A connector

Title (de)

Ein Verbinder

Title (fr)

Un connecteur

Publication

EP 1001491 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122320 A

Priority

JP 31912298 A

Abstract (en)

A connector includes a plug having a first plurality of terminals; a receptacle having a corresponding second plurality of terminals which are connected with the first plurality of terminals, respectively, when the plug is connected with the receptacle; each of the second plurality of terminals, which is connected with a corresponding one of the first plurality of terminals when the plug is connected with the receptacle, includes a plurality of sub-terminals formed independent of one another so that the plurality of sub-terminals are electrically connected with one another via the corresponding one of the first plurality of terminals when the plug is connected with the receptacle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 13/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/70 (2013.01); H01R 12/7088 (2013.01); H01R 12/73 (2013.01); H01R 12/712 (2013.01); H01R 12/721 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001491 A2 20000517; EP 1001491 A3 20000913; CN 1253398 A 20000517; JP 2000195624 A 20000714; SG 78404 A1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011115

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/20 A, 7H 01R 13/703 B, 7H 01R 31/08 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI