Global Patent Index - EP 1001491 A3

EP 1001491 A3 2000-09-13 - A connector

Title (en)

A connector

Title (de)

Ein Verbinder

Title (fr)

Un connecteur

Publication

EP 1001491 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99122320 A

Priority

JP 31912298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001491A2] A connector includes a plug having a first plurality of terminals; a receptacle having a corresponding second plurality of terminals which are connected with the first plurality of terminals, respectively, when the plug is connected with the receptacle; each of the second plurality of terminals, which is connected with a corresponding one of the first plurality of terminals when the plug is connected with the receptacle, includes a plurality of sub-terminals formed independent of one another so that the plurality of sub-terminals are electrically connected with one another via the corresponding one of the first plurality of terminals when the plug is connected with the receptacle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/20; H01R 13/703; H01R 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 13/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/70 (2013.01); H01R 12/7088 (2013.01); H01R 12/73 (2013.01); H01R 12/712 (2013.01); H01R 12/721 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001491 A2 20000517; EP 1001491 A3 20000913; CN 1253398 A 20000517; JP 2000195624 A 20000714; SG 78404 A1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011115

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/20 A, 7H 01R 13/703 B, 7H 01R 31/08 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI