Global patent index - EP 1001626 A2

EP 1001626 A2 2000-05-17 - Video data recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (en)

Video data recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (de)

Videodatenaufnahme und -wiedergabegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'enregistrement et de réproduction des données vidéos

Publication

EP 1001626 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308688 A

Priority

JP 31759698 A

Abstract (en)

Each of a video data recording apparatus, a video data recording method, a video data reproducing apparatus, a video data reproducing method, a video data recording and reproducing apparatus, and a video data recording and reproducing method is interfaced using an MPEG2 elementary stream. An input elementary stream can be recorded to a record medium and reproduced therefrom. A recording side stream converting means converts an input elementary stream into a device stream, that is a stream suitable for a record medium. A recording means performs a recording process for the converted device stream and records the record data to the record medium. A reproducing means reproduces record data recorded on the record medium as a device stream. A reproducing side stream converting means converts the restored device stream into an elementary stream. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/926

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/85 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/92 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2006.01); H04N 7/52 (2006.01); H04N 9/804 (2006.01); H04N 5/7826 (2006.01); H04N 9/79 (2006.01); H04N 9/806 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/7921 (2013.01); H04N 21/236 (2013.01); H04N 21/4334 (2013.01); H04N 21/434 (2013.01); H04N 21/4402 (2013.01); H04N 5/765 (2013.01); H04N 5/78266 (2013.01); H04N 5/783 (2013.01); H04N 9/7925 (2013.01); H04N 9/8042 (2013.01); H04N 9/8047 (2013.01); H04N 9/8063 (2013.01); H04N 9/8205 (2013.01); H04N 9/888 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001626 A2 20000517; EP 1001626 A3 20030205; CN 1143301 C 20040324; CN 1257283 A 20000621; JP 2000152160 A 20000530; JP 4010066 B2 20071121; KR 100676093 B1 20070201; KR 20000035333 A 20000626; US 6654544 B1 20031125

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140603

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071109

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI