Global Patent Index - EP 1001656 A3

EP 1001656 A3 2000-08-16 - Electrical heating cable

Title (en)

Electrical heating cable

Title (de)

Elektrisches Heizkabel

Title (fr)

Câble chauffant électrique

Publication

EP 1001656 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121772 A

Priority

DE 19851920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001656A2] An electric heating cable comprises a core with a heating conductor wound on it, and additional high conductivity conductors which reduce the resistance over defined areas. An electric heating cable with sections of varying resistance, comprises a heating conductor wound on a core, with a resistance which is reduced over defined areas by additional high conductivity conductors. The heating areas are formed between the conductors. The additional conductors (3) extend along the core and are pressed against it. The core and the additional conductors form a self supporting unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001656 A2 20000517; EP 1001656 A3 20000816; DE 19851920 A1 20000518; NO 995489 A 20000512; NO 995489 D0 19991110; PL 336463 A1 20000522; SK 153899 A3 20000814

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI