Global Patent Index - EP 1001663 A3

EP 1001663 A3 2002-11-13 - Electronic ballast for operating high pressure gas discharge lamps

Title (en)

Electronic ballast for operating high pressure gas discharge lamps

Title (de)

Vorschaltgerät zum Betreiben von Hochdruckgasentladungslampen

Title (fr)

Ballast électronique pour alimenter des lampes à décharge haute pression

Publication

EP 1001663 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122183 A

Priority

DE 19851652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001663A2] The bias device has a DC/DC converter for converting the vehicle battery voltage into a regulated voltage and a H-bridge circuit containing four electronic switches (M1-M4), across which the high-pressure gas discharge lamp is connected as the load (ZL), supplied with a low-frequency rectangular voltage. The diagonally opposing pairs of electronic switches are controlled by a pair of relatively inverted digital signals (E1,E2), simultaneously fed to two further electronic switches (Q5,Q6) for short-circuiting the control circuit for the bridge electronic switches in the non-operative bridge diagonal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/292; H02M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2926 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851652 A1 20000511; EP 1001663 A2 20000517; EP 1001663 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030424

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/292 A, 7H 02M 1/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI