Global Patent Index - EP 1001690 A1

EP 1001690 A1 2000-05-24 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HIGH-REFLECTION CUT OF A GEM, METHOD FOR CUTTING A HIGH-REFLECTION GEM, AND THE CUT HIGH-REFLECTION GEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HIGH-REFLECTION CUT OF A GEM, METHOD FOR CUTTING A HIGH-REFLECTION GEM, AND THE CUT HIGH-REFLECTION GEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG EINES EDELSTEINSCHLIFFS MIT HOHER REFLEKTION, VERFAHREN ZUM SCHLEIFEN EINES EDELSTEINS MIT HOHER REFLEKTION SOWIE GESCHLIFFENER EDELSTEIN MIT HOHER REFLEKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA TAILLE HAUTE REFLEXION D'UNE PIERRE PRECIEUSE, PROCEDE DE TAILLE HAUTE REFLEXION D'UNE PIERRE PRECIEUSE ET PIERRE PRECIEUSE TAILLEE A HAUTE REFLEXION

Publication

EP 1001690 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938714 A

Priority

  • DE 19734036 A
  • EP 9804772 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734036A1] The invention relates to a method for determining a high-reflection cut of a gem, a method for cutting a high-reflection gem, and a cut high-reflection gem. According to the invention, the gems have at least three lower part main facets and at least three upper part main facets, the angle between the lower part main facets and the girdle plane being greater than the angle between the upper part main facets and the girdle plane. A table replaces the upper part main facets at an angle of 0 DEG . The lower part main facet angle is between 41 DEG and 46 DEG and the upper part main facet angle corresponds to an angle from a group of predetermined preferred angles. Said group of angles is determined according to the average refraction of light n (between 1.50 and 3.00) of the raw material being cut and the lower part main facet angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907244A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734036 A1 19990211; AT 280514 T 20041115; EP 1001690 A1 20000524; EP 1001690 B1 20041027; IL 125634 A 20030917; IL 125634 D0 19990411; JP 2001513340 A 20010904; US 6474102 B1 20021105; WO 9907244 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812178

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070730

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070730

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070730

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070730

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BURGER HELMUT

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BUERGER, HELMUT

- Free text: BUERGER, HELMUT#MAX-VON-LAUE-STRASSE 6/VIII,#80937 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BUERGER, HELMUT#MAX-VON-LAUE-STRASSE 6/VIII,#80937 MUENCHEN (DE)

2006-10-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-07 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812178 P 20041202

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL