Global patent index - EP 1001715 A1

EP 1001715 A1 2000-05-24 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING CARIES IN A CAVITY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REMOVING CARIES IN A CAVITY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON KARIES IN EINER KAVITÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ELIMINER DES CARIES DANS UNE CAVITE

Publication

EP 1001715 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929142 A

Priority

  • DE 19825262 A
  • EP 9903884 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825262A1] The invention relates to a method for removing caries (4) in a cavity (7). A flowable agent (11) containing a substance for dissolving caries (4) and/or solid particles (13) is introduced into the cavity (7) and in order to increase its effect, is subjected to vibrations made by a vibrating part (14) which is introduced into the agent (11) in the cavity (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61C 17/20; A61C 5/00; A61C 17/02; A61C 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 3/03 (2006.01); A61C 5/00 (2006.01); A61C 17/02 (2006.01); A61C 17/20 (2006.01); A61C 19/06 (2006.01); G01N 33/497 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61C 3/005 (2013.01); A61C 3/03 (2013.01); A61C 5/00 (2013.01); A61C 17/0208 (2013.01); A61C 17/20 (2013.01); A61C 19/063 (2013.01); G01N 33/497 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963904A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825262 A1 19991209; EP 1001715 A1 20000524; JP 2002517275 A 20020618; US 6290502 B1 20010918; WO 9963904 A2 19991216; WO 9963904 A3 20000316

INPADOC legal status

2007-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-01-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR REMOVING CARIES IN A CAVITY

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61C 17/20 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61C 5/00 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61C 17/02 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61C 19/06 B

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000103

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI