Global Patent Index - EP 1001725 A1

EP 1001725 A1 2000-05-24 - ANATOMICALLY SHAPED DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH HIGH LOBE RESILIENCY

Title (en)

ANATOMICALLY SHAPED DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH HIGH LOBE RESILIENCY

Title (de)

ANATOMISCH GEFORMTER ABSORBIERENDER WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT GROSSER ELASTIZITÄT DER ECKEN

Title (fr)

ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE POSSEDANT UNE FORME ANATOMIQUE ET DES LOBES D'UNE GRANDE ELASTICITE

Publication

EP 1001725 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944553 A

Priority

  • EP 98944553 A
  • EP 97113462 A
  • US 9817775 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895766A1] An anatomically shaped disposable absorbent article having a front end portion and a rear end portion and a periphery, and comprising a liquid pervious topsheet, a multilayer backsheet joined to said topsheet and an absorbent core intermediate the backsheet and the topsheet. The anatomically shaped disposable absorbent article has lobes provided by the topsheet and the backsheet extending beyond the absorbent core and has a reduced tendency to form folds in the lobes during the use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/472 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/51478 (2013.01); A61F 13/5146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907318A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895766 A1 19990210; AR 013282 A1 20001213; AU 744282 B2 20020221; AU 9207198 A 19990301; BR 9811724 A 20000926; CA 2299327 A1 19990218; CN 1270503 A 20001018; EP 1001725 A1 20000524; JP 2001513363 A 20010904; PE 103099 A1 19991208; WO 9907318 A1 19990218; ZA 9806944 B 19990205

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028535

2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-09-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE