Global Patent Index - EP 1001727 A1

EP 1001727 A1 2000-05-24 - VEHICLE

Title (en)

VEHICLE

Title (de)

FAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1001727 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98936501 A

Priority

  • GB 9802223 W
  • GB 9717125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908642A1] There is disclosed a vehicle (11) adapted to carry a wheelchair (12) comprising a chassis (13) on ground-engaging wheels (14A, 14B) and having a floor pan (15) adapted to receive and unload a wheel chair (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 3/08; A61G 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/06 (2006.01); A61G 5/04 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/061 (2013.01); A61G 5/1051 (2016.11); A61G 3/065 (2013.01); A61G 5/042 (2013.01); A61G 2203/14 (2013.01); A61G 2220/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908642 A1 19990225; AU 8547698 A 19990308; DE 69813235 D1 20030515; DE 69813235 T2 20040219; EP 1001727 A1 20000524; EP 1001727 B1 20030409; ES 2196591 T3 20031216; GB 9717125 D0 19971022

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070724

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060725

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060725

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060724

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060724

2005-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196591 T3

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE