Global Patent Index - EP 1001753 A1

EP 1001753 A1 2000-05-24 - LOW DOSED 15-DESOXYSPERGUALINE PREPARATIONS

Title (en)

LOW DOSED 15-DESOXYSPERGUALINE PREPARATIONS

Title (de)

NIEDRIGDOSIERTE 15-DESOXYSPERGUALIN-PRÄPARATE

Title (fr)

PREPARATIONS DE 15-DESOXYSPERGUALINE FAIBLEMENT DOSEES

Publication

EP 1001753 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939540 A

Priority

  • DE 19728436 A
  • EP 9803927 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728436A1] 15-desoxyspergualine or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof is suitable for producing an immunosuppressive anti-inflammatory or tumor-inhibiting medicament, which is effective in low daily doses of 20 to 600 mu g/kg body weight when it is applied to the mucosa. For this purpose, it is specially prepared in the form of a controlled dosage aerosol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/155; A61K 9/00; A61K 31/16; A61P 35/00; A61P 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/16 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/16 (2013.01); A61K 9/0043 (2013.01); A61K 9/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901123A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728436 A1 19990107; AU 8801498 A 19990125; CA 2294785 A1 19990114; DE 19880842 D2 20001130; EP 1001753 A1 20000524; HU 0003038 A2 20010129; HU 0003038 A3 20030528; JP 2002507221 A 20020305; PL 337802 A1 20000911; TR 199903322 T2 20000921; US 6166087 A 20001226; WO 9901123 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050111

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/155 A

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/16 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 37/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/155 A

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/16 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/00 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 37/00 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031127

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000127;LV PAYMENT 20000127;MK PAYMENT 20000127;RO PAYMENT 20000127;SI PAYMENT 20000127