Global patent index - EP 1001762 A1

EP 1001762 A1 2000-05-24 - METHOD OF USING NEUROTROPHIC CARBAMATES AND UREAS

Title (en)

METHOD OF USING NEUROTROPHIC CARBAMATES AND UREAS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR VERWENDUNG VON NEUROTHROPHISCHEN CARBAMATEN UND UREATEN

Title (fr)

METHODE D'UTILISATION DE CARBAMATES ET D'UREES NEUROTROPHIQUES

Publication

EP 1001762 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906647 A

Priority

  • US 9803485 W
  • US 80564697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837882A1] This invention relates to a method of using neurotrophic low molecular weight, small molecule carbamates and ureas having an affinity for FKBP-type immunophilins, as inhibitors of the enzyme activity associated with immunophilin proteins, particularly peptidyl-prolyl isomerase, or rotamase, enzyme activity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/34; A61K 31/535

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/17 (2006.01); A61K 31/27 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4439 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837882 A1 19980903; AR 011869 A1 20000913; AU 6181698 A 19980918; CA 2281096 A1 19980903; EP 1001762 A1 20000524; EP 1001762 A4 20020508; JP 2001513772 A 20010904; PA 8447901 A1 20000524; PE 46599 A1 19990512; ZA 9800825 B 19981019

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1027499

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-05-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/40 A

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990901

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990901;LT PAYMENT 19990901;LV PAYMENT 19990901;MK PAYMENT 19990901;RO PAYMENT 19990901;SI PAYMENT 19990901