Global Patent Index - EP 1001777 A1

EP 1001777 A1 2000-05-24 - FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

FIBRINOGEN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE FIBRINOGENE

Publication

EP 1001777 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935967 A

Priority

  • US 9815288 W
  • US 5378897 P
  • US 6354597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904796A1] This invention relates to a compound of formula (I) or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, which is effective for inhibiting platelet aggregation, pharmaceutical compositions for effecting such activity, and a method for inhibiting platelet aggregation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/495; C07D 237/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07D 211/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 211/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904796 A1 19990204; AU 8510398 A 19990216; CA 2297909 A1 19990204; CO 4970784 A1 20001107; EP 1001777 A1 20000524; EP 1001777 A4 20021009; JP 2002509547 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028552

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040508

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-10-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/495 A, 7C 07D 237/00 B, 7C 07D 211/62 B

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL