Global Patent Index - EP 1001816 A1

EP 1001816 A1 2000-05-24 - PERFLUORINATED-ETHER COMPOSITIONS AS DIAGNOSTIC CONTRAST AGENTS

Title (en)

PERFLUORINATED-ETHER COMPOSITIONS AS DIAGNOSTIC CONTRAST AGENTS

Title (de)

PERFLUORIETE ETHERN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN WIE KONTRASTMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'ETHER PERFLUORE UTILISEES COMME AGENTS DE CONTRASTE DIAGNOSTIQUES

Publication

EP 1001816 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97946447 A

Priority

  • US 9719900 W
  • US 3190396 P
  • US 80099397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9823298A1] Compositions and methods for providing an image of an internal region of a patient. Embodiments of the invention involve vesicle compositions comprising, in an aqueous carrier, a perfluorinated ether compound and vesicles comprising one or more stabilizing compounds. The compositions may be administered to a patient, and the patient may be scanned using diagnostic imaging, such as ultrasound, to obtain a visible image of an internal region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 49/04; C07C 19/08; C07C 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9823298 A1 19980604; AU 5161298 A 19980622; EP 1001816 A1 20000524; EP 1001816 A4 20020717

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027295

2003-05-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-07-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 49/04 A, 7C 07C 41/00 B, 7C 07C 19/08 B, 7A 61K 47/48 B

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990618

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT