Global Patent Index - EP 1001856 B1

EP 1001856 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING WELDED Cu AND Cu ALLOY PIPES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING WELDED Cu AND Cu ALLOY PIPES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESCHWEISSTEN ROHREN AUS Cu UND Cu-LEGIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE TUYAUX SOUDES EN Cu ET EN ALLIAGE DE Cu

Publication

EP 1001856 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943664 A

Priority

  • DE 9801898 W
  • DE 19734780 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734780C1] The method concerns production of welded copper and copper alloy pipes in a combined production line incorporating a casting installation, a hot-rolling mill, a pipe forming a welding section, and a drawing installation. The method includes the follow-ing steps: a) casting of a strip 45-200 mm wide and 10-75 mm thick at a rate of up to 22 m/min; b) hot-rolling of the strip at the casting speed plus stretching to obtain a strip 2-14 mm thick; c) cooling and descaling; d) cold-rolling to obtain a strip 0.9-6.3 mm thick; e) coiling of the strip; f) uncoiling of the strip and pipe forming; g) welding of the formed pipe after edge preparation; h) possible internal and external deburring; i) calibration and drawing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/083; B21C 37/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B21B 3/00 (2006.01); B21C 37/06 (2006.01); B21C 37/08 (2006.01); B21C 37/083 (2006.01); B21C 37/30 (2006.01); B21B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/0811 (2013.01); B21B 3/003 (2013.01); B21C 37/06 (2013.01); B21C 37/083 (2013.01); B21C 37/30 (2013.01); B21B 17/00 (2013.01); B21B 2003/005 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49991 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB GR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734780 C1 19981210; AT 228403 T 20021215; AU 735019 B2 20010628; AU 9151898 A 19990301; CA 2299372 A1 19990218; CA 2299372 C 20060627; CN 1100629 C 20030205; CN 1265612 A 20000906; EP 1001856 A1 20000524; EP 1001856 B1 20021127; ES 2183414 T3 20030316; ID 24050 A 20000706; JP 2001513443 A 20010904; PL 187804 B1 20041029; PL 338441 A1 20001106; TW 369441 B 19990911; US 6401323 B1 20020611; WO 9907491 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-20 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400644

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183414 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806458 20030109

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB GR IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228403 T 20021215

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB GR IT SE