Global Patent Index - EP 1001857 A1

EP 1001857 A1 2000-05-24 - STRIP WINDER

Title (en)

STRIP WINDER

Title (de)

BANDHASPEL

Title (fr)

ENROULEUSE DE BANDE

Publication

EP 1001857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948832 A

Priority

  • DE 19736260 A
  • DE 19809810 A
  • DE 19836177 A
  • EP 9805151 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6283403B1] The invention relates to a strip winder (1) for winding a hot or cold strip (25) into a coil, comprising a winder mandrel (2), pressure rolls (6-8) which can be in the form of comb rolls (6'-8') deflection cups (9-11), and a feed shaft (20). The aim of the invention is to improve a strip winder of this type so that a hot or cold strip (25) can be wound securely on the winder mandrel (2) even at high speeds and when the strip is thin. To that end, the deflection cups (9-11) have channels (18) whose outlet openings (19) are located in the cup area and the channels (18) are connected to a medium supply system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/06 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/34 (2013.01); B21C 47/06 (2013.01); B21C 47/3475 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908814A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6283403 B1 20010904; AT 213672 T 20020315; BR 9815586 A 20020115; CN 1104294 C 20030402; CN 1265053 A 20000830; EP 1001857 A1 20000524; EP 1001857 B1 20020227; ES 2173627 T3 20021016; JP 2001514970 A 20010918; JP 4325968 B2 20090902; WO 9908814 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803211

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 213672

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803211

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110814

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110814

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110813

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-03-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173627

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803211

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-04

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 213672

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-07-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE