Global Patent Index - EP 1001862 A1

EP 1001862 A1 2000-05-24 - ELECTROMAGNETIC STIRRING METHOD FOR CRYSTALLISERS AND RELATIVE CRYSTALLISER

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC STIRRING METHOD FOR CRYSTALLISERS AND RELATIVE CRYSTALLISER

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES REHRVERFAHREN FÜR STRANGGIESSKOKILLEN UND SPRECHENDE KOKILLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE BRASSAGE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE POUR CRISTALLISATEURS ET CRISTALLISATEUR ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1001862 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929575 A

Priority

  • IB 9801055 W
  • IT UD970122 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902286A1] Electromagnetic stirring method for crystallisers, of the type including plates or based thereon, employed in the continuous casting of billets, blooms, slabs, round pieces, the method employing means to generate a magnetic field interacting with the metal cast inside the crystalliser, the method including the circulation of electric currents (13) directly along the sidewalls of the crystalliser (10), the principal component of the currents (13) having a direction parallel to the casting axis (12) of the crystalliser (10) and a desired direction and intensity, the currents (13) generating electromagnetic forces with a direction perpendicular to the casting axis (12) with the function of obtaining a separation of the skin of the solidifying metal from the sidewall of the crystalliser and a consequent reduction in the friction between the skin and the sidewall. Crystalliser to achieve the method as above whereby each plate element (11), or each group of plate elements (11), is electrically insulated lengthwise from the adjacent plate elements (11), or the adjacent group of plate elements (11), and is associated with its own electric power supply means generating an electric current (13) whose principal component has a direction parallel to the casting axis (12) of the crystalliser (10) and the desired intensity and direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/115 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902286A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902286 A1 19990121; AT 212886 T 20020215; AU 7927698 A 19990208; DE 69803775 D1 20020321; DE 69803775 T2 20020814; EP 1001862 A1 20000524; EP 1001862 B1 20020206; ES 2172156 T3 20020916; IT 1295164 B1 19990430; IT UD970122 A1 19990111

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020709

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-11-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172156 T3

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803775 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000117

2002-02-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212886 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000117