Global Patent Index - EP 1001863 A1

EP 1001863 A1 2000-05-24 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VALVE SEAT BODY FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE, AND CORRESPONDING FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VALVE SEAT BODY FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE, AND CORRESPONDING FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VENTILSITZKÖRPERS FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL UND BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN SIEGE DE SOUPAPE POUR VALVE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT, ET VALVE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT AINSI OBTENUE

Publication

EP 1001863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959704 A

Priority

  • DE 9802928 W
  • DE 19757117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757117A1] A cylindrical valve seat body (25) is manufactured and a passage (32) is formed in it with an intake/ opening section (47,48), a guide section (31), and a valve seat section (26). The valve seat section is a truncated cone-shaped part of the passage. The guide section has alternating web-like guide parts (51) and channel-like flow passages (27). All guide parts are simultaniously finished via a tool consisting of a master ball (130). A raised valve seat (26') is formed on the valve seat section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 15/02; B24B 33/02; B24B 37/02; F02M 51/06; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 15/02 (2006.01); B24B 33/02 (2006.01); B24B 37/02 (2012.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); B24B 15/02 (2013.01); B24B 33/02 (2013.01); B24B 37/02 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 51/0682 (2013.01); Y10S 239/90 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49306 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49409 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932259A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757117 A1 19990624; BR 9807436 A 20000418; EP 1001863 A1 20000524; EP 1001863 B1 20020515; ES 2177104 T3 20021201; JP 2001513165 A 20010828; KR 20000071199 A 20001125; US 6189816 B1 20010220; WO 9932259 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804149

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061003

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177104 T3

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804149 20020620

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STIER, HUBERT

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT