Global Patent Index - EP 1001867 A1

EP 1001867 A1 2000-05-24 - HANDLE FOR HOUSEHOLD UTENSILS

Title (en)

HANDLE FOR HOUSEHOLD UTENSILS

Title (de)

STIEL FÜR HAUSHALTSGERÄTE

Title (fr)

MANCHE POUR USTENSILES MENAGERS

Publication

EP 1001867 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97938887 A

Priority

  • EP 9704320 W
  • DE 19630519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6311368B1] Disclosed is a handle for household utensils, in particular for floor cleaning utensils, the external polygonal contour of which presents side faces (6) and edges (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25G 1/04; A47L 13/42; B25G 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/42 (2006.01); B25G 1/04 (2006.01); B25G 1/10 (2006.01); B25G 3/18 (2006.01); B25G 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 3/18 (2013.01); B25G 1/04 (2013.01); B25G 1/102 (2013.01); B25G 3/26 (2013.01); Y10T 16/4719 (2013.01); Y10T 16/473 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907523A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6311368 B1 20011106; AT 209083 T 20011215; CA 2300393 A1 19990218; CA 2300393 C 20040511; DE 19630519 A1 19980205; DE 59706080 D1 20020221; EP 1001867 A1 20000524; EP 1001867 B1 20011121; ES 2167017 T3 20020501; PT 1001867 E 20020531; WO 9907523 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FIRMA CARL *FREUDENBERG

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050809

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050808

2006-04-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060208

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050809

2005-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050809

2005-08-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-08-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-08-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2004-08-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040820

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040820

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167017 T3

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706080 20020221

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-01-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209083 T 20011215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE