Global Patent Index - EP 1001874 A1

EP 1001874 A1 2000-05-24 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STICKING TWO HALVES OF A DVD (DIGITAL VERSATILE DISC)

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STICKING TWO HALVES OF A DVD (DIGITAL VERSATILE DISC)

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERKLEBEN VON ZWEI DVD (DIGITAL VERSATILE DISC)-HALBSEITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COLLER DEUX MOITIES D'UN DVD

Publication

EP 1001874 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943858 A

Priority

  • DE 19734056 A
  • EP 9804913 W
  • US 6242397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907542A1] The invention relates to a method for sticking two halves (23, 24) of a dvd (digital versatile disc). Said halves are held at a distance from each other so that a gap forms between them. The adhesive (36) is then introduced into said gap and is spread over both halves. The invention is characterised in that the adhesive is introduced via the central hole in the DVD by means of e.g., L-shaped metering needles (63) which are pivotably guided in a central pin, said pin dipping into the central hole (51), or flexible plastic needles which are guided in a guiding tube in such a way that they can move. Introducing the adhesive via the central hole means that the adhesive can flow freely out of the metering needle as the DVD halves (23, 24) turn. There is no build-up of adhesive in front of the metering needle and the sticking process can continue until the spinning process is complete, without any interruption of the application of adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 65/52; B32B 31/12; G11B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 65/52 (2006.01); B32B 37/12 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 65/521 (2013.01); B29C 65/1406 (2013.01); B29C 65/1435 (2013.01); B29C 65/1483 (2013.01); B29C 65/7847 (2013.01); B29C 66/452 (2013.01); B29C 66/8322 (2013.01); B29C 65/4815 (2013.01); B29C 65/4845 (2013.01); B29C 66/71 (2013.01); B29L 2017/003 (2013.01); B29L 2017/005 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1798 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B29C 66/71 + B29K 2069/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907542A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907542 A1 19990218; CA 2299255 A1 19990218; DE 19835660 A1 19990304; EP 1001874 A1 20000524; US 2001030012 A1 20011018; US 6425968 B1 20020730; US 6634405 B2 20031021

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAUSSMAFFEI TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2008-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAUSMAFFEI TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2007-12-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/52 20060101AFI20071120BHEP

2007-12-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G11B 7/26 20060101ALI20071120BHEP

2007-12-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B32B 37/12 20060101ALI20071120BHEP

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAUSS MAFFEI GMBH

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE