Global patent index - EP 1001877 A1

EP 1001877 A1 2000-05-24 - MACHINE FOR GLUING FOLDING CARTONS FOR PRODUCING FOLDING CARTONS FROM BLANKS

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR GLUING FOLDING CARTONS FOR PRODUCING FOLDING CARTONS FROM BLANKS

Title (de)

FALTSCHACHTELKLEBEMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FALTSCHACHTELN AUS ZUSCHNITTEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE A COLLER LES BOITES PLIANTES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE BOITES PLIANTES A PARTIR DE DECOUPES

Publication

EP 1001877 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927821 A

Priority

  • DE 19824982 A
  • DE 19828819 A
  • EP 9903784 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962700A1] Known machines for gluing folding cartons for the production of folding cartons from blanks have devices for transporting the blanks through the machine which comprise lower conveying belts (7) and upper conveying belts (14), the lower conveying belts (7) being mounted on a roller cheek (8) which can be transversally moved by a drive and the upper conveying belts (14) being mounted on a transversally mobile roller track. The invention provides for an endless rope or band-like element, preferably a wire rope (21), to be arranged in the machine such that it is able to move freely in its longitudinal direction and forms two strands, so that a loop (21) below the conveying plane of the blanks extends cross-wise across the width of the machine and a second loop (22) which is parallel to the first loop (21) above the machine extends cross-wise across the width of the machine. The roller cheek (8) is fixedly joined to one strand of the lower loop (21) and the roller track (15) can be clamped to the other strand of the upper loop (22). In this way the roller track (15) is entrained during a transverse movement of the roller cheek (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/04; B65H 29/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B31B 2201/0247 (2013.01); B31B 2201/0288 (2013.01); B65H 2511/12 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1766 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962700 A1 19991209; DE 19828819 A1 19991209; DE 59910508 D1 20041021; EP 1001877 A1 20000524; EP 1001877 B1 20040915; ES 2228058 T3 20050401; JP 2002516772 A 20020611; JP 4235364 B2 20090311; US 6419079 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2228058

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINENAKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991224

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI