Global Patent Index - EP 1001878 A1

EP 1001878 A1 2000-05-24 - MACHINE FOR GLUING FOLDING CARTONS FOR PRODUCING FOLDING CARTONS FROM BLANKS

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR GLUING FOLDING CARTONS FOR PRODUCING FOLDING CARTONS FROM BLANKS

Title (de)

FALTSCHACHTELKLEBEMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FALTSCHACHTELN AUS ZUSCHNITTEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE A COLLER LES BOITES PLIANTES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE BOITES PLIANTES A PARTIR DE DECOUPES

Publication

EP 1001878 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927823 A

Priority

  • DE 19824985 A
  • DE 19828820 A
  • EP 9903786 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6503181B1] A collapsible-box gluing machine for the production of collapsible boxes from blanks has a folding station for folding blanks, a subsequently arranged transfer station and a collecting and compression device, wherein the flat-lying folded collapsible boxes are pressed for the bonding of the adhesive. The transfer station has at least one pair of conveyor belts as a conveying device, which consists of a lower belt and an upper belt. In order to transfer the blanks with precisely positioned side flaps to the collecting and compression device, the transfer station has a variable ratio transmission to drive the upper conveyor belts at a higher speed than the lower conveyor belts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/96; B31B 1/04; B31B 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/04 (2006.01); B31B 1/62 (2006.01); B31B 1/96 (2006.01); B31B 5/26 (2006.01); B31B 5/74 (2006.01); B65H 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/023 (2013.01); B31B 2201/0247 (2013.01); B31B 2201/27 (2013.01); B31B 2201/6021 (2013.01); B31B 2201/925 (2013.01); B31B 2203/003 (2013.01); B31B 2203/082 (2013.01); B65H 2513/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6503181 B1 20030107; EP 1001878 A1 20000524; EP 1001878 B1 20040331; ES 2217765 T3 20041101; WO 9962701 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59909022

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0001960000

- IPC: B31B0050960000

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GLN S.A., CH

2015-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2015-06-24 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20150618

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, 69115 HEIDELBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59909022

- Effective date: 20150402

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217765 T3

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909022 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINENAKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991224

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI