Global patent index - EP 1001909 A1

EP 1001909 A1 2000-05-24 - PACKAGING METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

PACKAGING METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONDITIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1001909 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937688 A

Priority

  • GB 9802373 W
  • GB 9716647 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907630A1] A method of and apparatus for packaging of trimmer line comprises means to feed a length of trimmer line (2) from a supply source (4) into a closed container or package (10) through a hole or aperture (10A) in said container or package, and means (30) to sever the trimmer line (2) when a predetermined length thereof has been fed into said closed container or package. The apparatus includes a conveyor (12) to feed said closed container or package to a filling station for filling with trimmer line and to remove the filled container or package from said filling station, and the apparatus further includes guide means in the form of pinch wheels (24) to guide the trimmer line into said closed container or package.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/76; B65H 61/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/76 (2006.01); B65H 61/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/76 (2013.01); B65H 61/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907630A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907630 A1 19990218; AU 8640698 A 19990301; EP 1001909 A1 20000524; EP 1001909 B1 20011212; EP 1001909 B2 20050406; GB 9716647 D0 19971015

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-19 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S28

- Free Format Text: RESTORATION ALLOWED

- Effective date: 20150727

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140806

2015-07-08 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S28

- Free Format Text: APPLICATION FILED

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140806

2005-04-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BLACK & DECKER

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB