Global Patent Index - EP 1001964 A1

EP 1001964 A1 2000-05-24 - TANGO-78, TANGO-79, AND TANGO-81 NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

TANGO-78, TANGO-79, AND TANGO-81 NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

TANGO-78, TANGO-79 UND TANGO-81 NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE UND POLYPEPTIDE

Title (fr)

MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE TANGO-78, TANGO-79 ET TANGO-81

Publication

EP 1001964 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939212 A

Priority

  • US 9816241 W
  • US 5464597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906427A1] The invention relates to Tango-78, Tango-79, and Tango-81 polypeptides, nucleic acid molecules encoding Tango-78, Tango-79, and Tango-81, and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; C07H 1/00; C07H 17/00; C07H 21/04; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906427 A1 19990211; AU 8768798 A 19990222; CA 2299276 A1 19990211; EP 1001964 A1 20000524; EP 1001964 A4 20030423; JP 2001512003 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20060510

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-04-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030307

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE