Global Patent Index - EP 1001966 A4

EP 1001966 A4 2002-09-18 - A SENESCENCE GENE AND ITS USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND OTHER DISEASES

Title (en)

A SENESCENCE GENE AND ITS USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND OTHER DISEASES

Title (de)

EIN SENESCENE-GEN UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND ANDEREN KRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

GENE DE SENESCENCE ET SON UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET D'AUTRES MALADIES

Publication

EP 1001966 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98933073 A

Priority

  • US 9813743 W
  • US 5162697 P
  • US 98584597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901465A1] The gene sequences that comprise genetic determinants that control the capacity of cells to proliferate and methods for isolating same are provided. The sequences can be used in a gene therapy for cancer and viral infection, particularly AIDS.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/00; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 2 April 1993 (1993-04-02), OHARA ET AL.: "Human mRNA for KIAAA0026 gene, complete cds", XP002206665, Database accession no. D14812
  • See also references of WO 9901465A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901465 A1 19990114; AU 8282498 A 19990125; EP 1001966 A1 20000524; EP 1001966 A4 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000204

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07H 21/04 A, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7C 07K 14/00 B, 7C 07K 16/00 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PEREIRA-SMITH, OLIVIA, M.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NING, YI

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERTRAM, MICHAEL, J.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERUBE, NATHALIE

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SWANSON, XIN

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEUNG, JAMES K.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAN, QITAO

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PEREIRA-SMITH, OLIVIA, M.

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NING, YI

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERTRAM, MICHAEL, J.

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERUBE, NATHALIE

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SWANSON, XIN

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEUNG, JAMES K.

2000-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAN, QITAO

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE