Global Patent Index - EP 1001981 A4

EP 1001981 A4 2000-09-27 - HEREGULIN-LIKE FACTOR

Title (en)

HEREGULIN-LIKE FACTOR

Title (de)

HEREGULIN-ÄHNLICHER FAKTOR

Title (fr)

FACTEUR DE TYPE HEREGULINE

Publication

EP 1001981 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98929072 A

Priority

  • US 9812403 W
  • US 4994297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857989A1] The present invention relates to a novel HLF protein which is a member of the heregulin family. In particular, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding the human HLF protein. HLF polypeptides are also provided as are vectors, host cells and recombinant methods for producing the same. The invention further relates to screening methods for identifying agonists and antagonists of HLF activity. Also provided are diagnostic methods for detecting disorders of the regulation of cell growth and therapeutic methods for treating disorders of the regulation of cell growth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/435; C07K 14/47; C07K 14/475; C07K 16/24; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/19; C12N 15/64; G01N 33/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57488 (2013.01); C07K 14/4702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9902681 A1 19990121 - GENENTECH INC [US]
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 8 July 1995 (1995-07-08), HILLIER L., ET AL.: "Homo sapiens cDNA clone, 5' similar to SP: A43273 heregulin-alpha precursor", XP002143371
  • [X] LAVERRIERE ANNE C ET AL: "GATA-4/5/6, a subfamily of three transcription factors transcribed in developing heart and gut.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 269, no. 37, 1994, pages 23177 - 23184, XP000919296, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [A] CULOUSCOU J -M ET AL: "CHARACTERIZATION OF A BREAST CANCER CELL DIFFERENTIATION FACTOR THAT SPECIFICALLY ACTIVATES THE HER4/P180ERB4 RECEPTOR", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, vol. 268, no. 25, 5 September 1993 (1993-09-05), pages 18407 - 18410, XP002004423, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [A] GARRAWAY K L ET AL: "Neuregulin-2, a new ligand of Erb3/Erb4-receptor tyrosine kinase", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, no. 387, 29 May 1997 (1997-05-29), pages 512 - 516, XP002080140, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [A] GASSMANN MARTIN ET AL: "Aberrant neural and cardiac development in mice lacking the ErbB4 neuregulin receptor.", NATURE (LONDON), vol. 378, no. 6555, 1995, pages 390 - 394, XP000919298, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [T] HIJAZI MAI M ET AL: "NRG-3 in human breast cancers: Activation of multiple erbB family proteins.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, vol. 13, no. 5, November 1998 (1998-11-01), pages 1061 - 1067, XP000917096, ISSN: 1019-6439
  • [T] DATABASE EMBL 7 January 2000 (2000-01-07), PLUMB, B. ET AL.: "Human DNA sequence from clone RP1-185K11", XP002143372
  • See also references of WO 9857989A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857989 A1 19981223; AU 8072498 A 19990104; CA 2295317 A1 19981223; EP 1001981 A1 20000524; EP 1001981 A4 20000927; JP 2002503967 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040105

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE