Global Patent Index - EP 1001990 A1

EP 1001990 A1 2000-05-24 - PROTEIN THAT BINDS TRAIL

Title (en)

PROTEIN THAT BINDS TRAIL

Title (de)

TRAIL BINDENDES PROTEIN

Title (fr)

PROTEINE SE FIXANT A LA PROTEINE TRAIL

Publication

EP 1001990 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931713 A

Priority

  • US 9813491 W
  • US 88352997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900423A1] A protein designated TRAIL-BP binds the protein known as TNF-Related Apoptosis-Inducing Ligand (TRAIL). The TRAIL-BP finds use in purifying TRAIL or inhibiting activities thereof. Isolated DNA sequences encoding TRAIL-BP are provided, along with expression vectors containing the DNA sequences, and host cells transformed with such recombinant expression vectors. Antibodies that are immunoreactive with TRAIL-BP are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/71; A61K 38/17; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/10; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70578 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900423 A1 19990107; AU 756759 B2 20030123; AU 8175898 A 19990119; CA 2294704 A1 19990107; EP 1001990 A1 20000524; EP 1001990 A4 20011219; IL 133602 D0 20010430; JP 2002507127 A 20020305; NZ 501831 A 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029795

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-12-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WALCZAK, HENNING

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SMITH, CRAIG, A.

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMMUNEX CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE