Global Patent Index - EP 1001990 A4

EP 1001990 A4 2001-12-19 - PROTEIN THAT BINDS TRAIL

Title (en)

PROTEIN THAT BINDS TRAIL

Title (de)

TRAIL BINDENDES PROTEIN

Title (fr)

PROTEINE SE FIXANT A LA PROTEINE TRAIL

Publication

EP 1001990 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98931713 A

Priority

  • US 9813491 W
  • US 88352997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900423A1] A protein designated TRAIL-BP binds the protein known as TNF-Related Apoptosis-Inducing Ligand (TRAIL). The TRAIL-BP finds use in purifying TRAIL or inhibiting activities thereof. Isolated DNA sequences encoding TRAIL-BP are provided, along with expression vectors containing the DNA sequences, and host cells transformed with such recombinant expression vectors. Antibodies that are immunoreactive with TRAIL-BP are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/71; A61K 38/17; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/10; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70578 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9830693 A2 19980716 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [E] EP 0867509 A2 19980930 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [E] WO 9858062 A1 19981223 - GENENTECH INC [US]
  • [A] WILEY S R ET AL: "Identification and characterization of a new member of the TNF family that induces apoptosis", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US, vol. 3, no. 6, 1 December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 673 - 682, XP000672297, ISSN: 1074-7613
  • See also references of WO 9900423A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900423 A1 19990107; AU 756759 B2 20030123; AU 8175898 A 19990119; CA 2294704 A1 19990107; EP 1001990 A1 20000524; EP 1001990 A4 20011219; IL 133602 D0 20010430; JP 2002507127 A 20020305; NZ 501831 A 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029795

2003-07-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-12-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WALCZAK, HENNING

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SMITH, CRAIG, A.

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMMUNEX CORPORATION

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE