Global Patent Index - EP 1002033 A1

EP 1002033 A1 2000-05-24 - LOW VISCOSITY DISPERSION FOR PAPER OR TEXTILE PROCESSING

Title (en)

LOW VISCOSITY DISPERSION FOR PAPER OR TEXTILE PROCESSING

Title (de)

NIEDRIGVISKOSE DISPERSION ZUR PAPIER- UND TEXTILBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPERSION DE FAIBLE VISCOSITE DESTINEE AU TRAITEMENT DU PAPIER ET DU TEXTILE

Publication

EP 1002033 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941384 A

Priority

  • DE 19732396 A
  • EP 9804534 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732396A1] The invention relates to a concentrated low viscosity aqueous dispersion containing a) a nonionic softening agent selected from among glycerin monoesters or diesters with fat acids C8-22, and theirs blends; b) a polyol compound, preferably glycerin, diethylene glucol, polyethylene glycol or 1-2-propylene glucol and their blends; c) cationic and nonionic emulsifiers; d) 70 to 90 wt. % water and possibly other appropriate auxiliary agents and additives for softening paper or textile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/835; D06M 13/148; D06M 13/224; D21H 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 17/18 (2006.01); B01F 17/42 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); D06M 13/148 (2006.01); D06M 13/165 (2006.01); D06M 13/17 (2006.01); D06M 13/224 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 15/53 (2006.01); D21H 21/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/148 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 3/2044 (2013.01); D06M 13/165 (2013.01); D06M 13/17 (2013.01); D06M 13/2243 (2013.01); D06M 13/463 (2013.01); D06M 15/53 (2013.01); D21H 21/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); D06M 2200/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905246A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732396 A1 19990204; EP 1002033 A1 20000524; EP 1002033 B1 20040331; ES 2218847 T3 20041116; PT 1002033 E 20040831; WO 9905246 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-01-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2218847

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT