Global patent index - EP 1002102 A1

EP 1002102 A1 2000-05-24 - CELLULOSE DEGRADING ENZYMES OF ASPERGILLUS

Title (en)

CELLULOSE DEGRADING ENZYMES OF ASPERGILLUS

Title (de)

ZELLULOSE ABBAUENDE ENZYME VON ASPERGILLUS

Title (fr)

ENZYMES DE L'ASPERGILLUS DEGRADANT LA CELLULOSE

Publication

EP 1002102 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945192 A

Priority

  • EP 98945192 A
  • EP 9805047 W
  • EP 97202389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906574A1] Two cellobiohydrolase polypeptides (CBHA and CBHB) derived from Aspergillus are described and can be used to degrade cellulose. Variants of these peptides are described as well as DNA encoding the peptides, vectors and host cells. The peptides can be used to produce or process food, animal feed, wood pulp, paper and textiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/56; A21D 8/04; A23L 1/00; A23L 2/00; C12N 9/42; C12S 3/04; C12S 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 2/00 (2006.01); A21D 8/04 (2006.01); A23L 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/42 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/56 (2006.01); C12S 3/04 (2006.01); C12S 3/08 (2006.01); C12R 1/685 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/2437 (2013.01); A21D 8/042 (2013.01); C12Y 302/01091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906574 A1 19990211; AU 739445 B2 20011011; AU 9259698 A 19990222; BR 9812113 A 20000718; CA 2298885 A1 19990211; EP 1002102 A1 20000524; JP 2001512024 A 20010821; NZ 502444 A 20011130; US 2004001904 A1 20040101; US 6558937 B1 20030506

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DSM IP ASSETS B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GIELKENS, MARCUS, MATHEUS, CATHARINA

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VISSER, JACOB

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DE GRAAFF, LEENDERT, HENDRIK

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000124;LT PAYMENT 20000124;LV PAYMENT 20000124;MK PAYMENT 20000124;RO PAYMENT 20000124;SI PAYMENT 20000124