Global patent index - EP 1002131 A2

EP 1002131 A2 2000-05-24 - BIALLELIC MARKERS FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTING A HIGH DENSITY DISEQUILIBRIUM MAP OF THE HUMAN GENOME

Title (en)

BIALLELIC MARKERS FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTING A HIGH DENSITY DISEQUILIBRIUM MAP OF THE HUMAN GENOME

Title (de)

BIALLELISCHE MARKER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DISEQUILIBIUMKARTEN DES HUMANEN GENOMS MIT HOHER DICHTE

Title (fr)

MARQUEURS BIALLELES CONVENANT A LA CONSTITUTION D'UNE CARTE HAUTE DENSITE DES DESEQUILIBRES DU GENOME HUMAIN

Publication

EP 1002131 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98935225 A

Priority

  • EP 98935225 A
  • EP 97401740 A
  • IB 9801193 W
  • US 8261498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892068A1] Methods for generating a high density linkage disequilibrium map of the human genome, markers obtained by the said methods, probes capable of hybridising with the said markers, and primers capable of detecting the said markers, oligonucleotide arrays comprising sets of the said probes or primers, diagnostic assay using the said probes and genes identified by the said methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6876 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6827 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6837 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6841 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/172 (2013.01); Y10T 436/143333 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892068 A1 19990120; AU 746682 B2 20020502; AU 8456998 A 19990210; CA 2296401 A1 19990128; EP 1002131 A2 20000524; WO 9904038 A2 19990128; WO 9904038 A3 19990610

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081128

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SERONO GENETICS INSTITUTE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENSET

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE