Global Patent Index - EP 1002151 A1

EP 1002151 A1 2000-05-24 - CONTINUOUS HIGH TEMPERATURE, HIGH PRESSURE CALENDERING/DECATISING/FIXING METHOD FOR FABRICS AND RELATIVE DEVICE

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS HIGH TEMPERATURE, HIGH PRESSURE CALENDERING/DECATISING/FIXING METHOD FOR FABRICS AND RELATIVE DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN PRESSEN, DEKATIEREN UND FIXIEREN VON BAHNFÖRMIGEM TEXTILGUT BEI HOHER TEMPERATUR UND UNTER HOHEM DRUCK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CALANDRAGE, DECATISSAGE, FIXAGE EN CONTINU ET SOUS FORTES TEMPERATURE ET PRESSION DE TISSUS ET APPAREIL ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1002151 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932462 A

Priority

  • IB 9801142 W
  • IT UD970145 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907933A1] Continuous high temperature and high pressure calendering/decatising/fixing method for woollen fabric, wool mix, silk, cellulose, synthetic fabrics or non-fabrics, wherein the fabric (11) is subjected to steam treatment or treatment in super-heated water, the steam treatment or treatment in super-heated water being performed by introducing the fabric (11) inside a sealed chamber (13), the sealed chamber (13) being defined by at least four cylinders (14a, 14b, 15a, 15b) arranged in a foulard configuration with adjustable pressure and by front sealing plates (17) associated with the ends of the cylinders (14a, 14b, 15a, 15b), inside the sealed chamber (13) at least one face of the fabric (11) being in direct contact with at least one of the cylinders (14a, 14b, 15a, 15b). Device achieving the method as above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 7/00; D06C 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 7/00 (2006.01); D06C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 7/00 (2013.01); D06C 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907933A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907933 A1 19990218; AT 237017 T 20030415; AU 8237798 A 19990301; DE 69813239 D1 20030515; DE 69813239 T2 20040129; EP 1002151 A1 20000524; EP 1002151 B1 20030409; ES 2197479 T3 20040101; IT 1295735 B1 19990527; IT UD970145 A1 19990208

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040728

2005-07-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030727

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197479 T3

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030807

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030727

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT