Global Patent Index - EP 1002152 A1

EP 1002152 A1 2000-05-24 - IRONING MACHINE WITH HEATING CYLINDER AND CIRCULATION OF AIR

Title (en)

IRONING MACHINE WITH HEATING CYLINDER AND CIRCULATION OF AIR

Title (de)

BÜGELMASCHINE MIT HEIZZYLINDER UND LUFTUMWÄLZUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE A REPASSER A CYLINDRE CHAUFFANT ET A CIRCULATION D'AIR

Publication

EP 1002152 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97931887 A

Priority

  • FR 9701221 W
  • FR 9608471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801612A1] In an ironing machine with a rotary ironing cylinder (14), comprising heating means (42) located in a space (40) intermediate between the cylinder (14) and a fixed internal tube (34), circulation of air is provided inside the cylinder. Two fans (62, 68) draw the air contained in the end regions of the space (40) through suction apertures (46, 48), to blow it into a central region of this space, through delivery apertures (50, 52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9801612A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801612 A1 19980115; CZ 290378 B6 20020717; CZ 9800697 A3 19980715; DE 69717318 D1 20030102; DE 69717318 T2 20030828; EP 1002152 A1 20000524; EP 1002152 B1 20021120; ES 2185955 T3 20030501; FR 2750710 A1 19980109; FR 2750710 B1 19981127; TR 199800416 T1 19990222; US 5933988 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170708

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170706

2017-07-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170706

2017-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69717318

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185955 T3

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717318 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980209

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI