Global Patent Index - EP 1002172 A1

EP 1002172 A1 2000-05-24 - CONCRETE SUPPLY ARM WITH ARTICULATED SECTIONS

Title (en)

CONCRETE SUPPLY ARM WITH ARTICULATED SECTIONS

Title (de)

BETONVERTEILUNGS-ARM MIT ARTIKULIERENDEN TEILEN

Title (fr)

BRAS D'ALIMENTATION EN BETON PRESENTANT DES PARTIES ARTICULEES

Publication

EP 1002172 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98941399 A

Priority

  • EP 9804588 W
  • IT MI971835 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894915A1] The invention relates to a concrete supply arm, to be mounted in particular on vehicle-transported concrete pumps, having several sections (11,12) and articulating joints between said sections. In this arm the relative movement of the sections (11,12) is performed, in correspondence of at least some of the articulating joints of the arm, by means of actuator mechanisms (23) consisting of a worm gear actuated by a hydraulic motor. Conveniently said actuators also comprise a locking brake. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2013.01); E04G 21/0436 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894915 A1 19990203; AR 015139 A1 20010418; AT 206793 T 20011015; AU 8978498 A 19990222; CA 2298508 A1 19990211; CN 1265719 A 20000906; CO 4840534 A1 19990927; DE 69801997 D1 20011115; DE 69801997 T2 20020516; DK 1002172 T3 20020211; EP 1002172 A1 20000524; EP 1002172 B1 20011010; ES 2165698 T3 20020316; HR P20000046 A2 20011031; IT 1293518 B1 19990301; IT MI971835 A1 19990201; PL 338450 A1 20001106; PT 1002172 E 20020328; TR 200000265 T2 20000522; WO 9906650 A1 19990211; ZA 9806638 B 19990202

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150723

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160829

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-04-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150122

2015-04-06 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020400028

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150122

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120722

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CIFA S.P.A.

- Free text: CIFA S.P.A.#VIALE RIMEMBRANZE, 2#20026 NOVATE MILANESE, MILANO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- CIFA S.P.A.#VIALE RIMEMBRANZE, 2#20026 NOVATE MILANESE, MILANO (IT)

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400028

2002-03-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165698 T3

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801997 20011115

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206793 T 20011015

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000219

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE