Global Patent Index - EP 1002175 A1

EP 1002175 A1 2000-05-24 - DEVICE FOR VERTICAL ARRANGEMENT OF A POLE OR POST-LIKE OBJECT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR VERTICAL ARRANGEMENT OF A POLE OR POST-LIKE OBJECT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERTIKALEN ANORDNEN EINES PFAHL- ODER PFOSTENFÖRMIGEN GEGENSTANDES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DESTINE AU PLACEMENT VERTICAL D'UN OBJET EN FORME DE PIEU OU DE POTEAU

Publication

EP 1002175 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97935491 A

Priority

DE 9701585 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906656A1] Disclosed is a device for vertical arrangement of a pole or post-like object (4) on a fixing device (6) located in the ground, comprising a substantially cylindrical, longitudinally extended holding drift (10) which protrudes upwards from the free upper side of the fixing device (6) and which can be inserted into a receiving bore hole (12) on the lower front face (14) of the pole or post-like object (4). Also provided is a support plate(16) which is separate from the fixing device (6) and can be fixed onto the lower front face (14) of the pole or post-like object. At least one fixing attachment (18) protrudes upwards therefrom. In the middle of the support plate (16) there is an orifice (24) which is at least partially adapted to the cross section of the holding drift (10). The support plate (16) also has a clamping section (26) which borders on the central orifice (24) and which is oriented in the same direction as the at least one attachment (18). Preferably, said clamping element is configured as a cylindrical sleeve (28) with at least one slot arranged in its circumference in an axial direction. Said sleeve is radially expanded when mounted on the holding drift (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/2284 (2013.01); E04H 12/2253 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906656A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906656 A1 19990211; AT 226997 T 20021115; AU 3847097 A 19990222; CA 2298532 A1 19990211; DE 19781969 D2 20000810; DE 59708636 D1 20021205; EP 1002175 A1 20000524; EP 1002175 B1 20021030; US 6168129 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708636

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030728

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRINNER INNOVATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708636 20021205

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226997 T 20021115

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRINNER INNOVATION GMBH

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRINNER, KLAUS

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE