Global Patent Index - EP 1002177 A2

EP 1002177 A2 2000-05-24 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A REMOTE CONTROL, AND REMOTE CONTROL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING A REMOTE CONTROL, AND REMOTE CONTROL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER FERNBEDIENUNG, UND FERNBEDIENUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE TELECOMMANDE, ET TELECOMMANDE ASSOCIEE

Publication

EP 1002177 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98948731 A

Priority

  • DE 9802253 W
  • DE 19734341 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734341A1] The invention relates to a method for associating a remote control to a base station. The base station (10) emits a search signal which the remote control (20) receives and compares with a reference signal. If the search signal corresponds to the reference signal the remote control (20) emits a contact signal. When the base station (10) receives certain predefined contact signals back, it emits an identification signal (114). The remote control (20) receives this identification signal (114) and sends a code signal (17) back to the base station. This code signal (17) identifies the remote control (20) uniquely.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 9/00 (2006.01); G08C 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908471A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734341 A1 19990211; AU 732966 B2 20010503; AU 9529598 A 19990301; EP 1002177 A2 20000524; EP 1002177 B1 20040107; ES 2214733 T3 20040916; JP 2001513616 A 20010904; US 6633227 B1 20031014; WO 9908471 A2 19990218; WO 9908471 A3 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070806

2006-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214733 T3

2004-04-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810558 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT