Global Patent Index - EP 1002184 A1

EP 1002184 A1 2000-05-24 - HOUSING FOR A FAN, PUMP OR COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

HOUSING FOR A FAN, PUMP OR COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

GEHÄUSE FÜR EINE STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CARTER POUR TURBOMACHINE

Publication

EP 1002184 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954169 A

Priority

  • DE 9802703 W
  • DE 19742621 A
  • DE 19834221 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917000A1] The invention relates to a component (1), especially for the shaft seal (9) of a fan, pump or compressor (11), made from a first cast metal material. The component (1) has at least one inner wall which is formed partially in a peripheral direction to the shaft axis, an outer wall (3) which is directed towards an outer area (16) and at least one fluid line (5,6) which is made of a second metal material. A fluid guideway (4A,4B) running at least partially in the direction of the periphery is also provided. Said guideway is flow-connected to the fluid line (5,6) and opens out towards the inner wall (2). The fluid line (5,6) is sealed into the first material and connects the inner wall to the outer area (16) by flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 9/06; F01D 11/04; F01D 25/16; F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/06 (2006.01); F01D 11/04 (2006.01); F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/04 (2013.01); F01D 9/065 (2013.01); F01D 25/16 (2013.01); F01D 25/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917000A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917000 A1 19990408; AT 228203 T 20021215; CN 1143946 C 20040331; CN 1271403 A 20001025; EP 1002184 A1 20000524; EP 1002184 B1 20021120; JP 2001518588 A 20011016; JP 4217001 B2 20090128; US 6241465 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140911

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140911

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806363

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140911

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806363

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806363 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228203 T 20021215

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011214

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI