Global Patent Index - EP 1002198 A1

EP 1002198 A1 2000-05-24 - SHOCK-PROOF HYDRAULIC CYLINDER

Title (en)

SHOCK-PROOF HYDRAULIC CYLINDER

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHER ZYLINDER MIT STOSSSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

CYLINDRE HYDRAULIQUE RESISTANT AUX CHOCS

Publication

EP 1002198 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922767 A

Priority

  • DE 29707639 U
  • EP 9802408 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6283008B1] The invention relates to a shockproof hydraulic cylinder that has a cylinder housing (1), in which a plunger (4) that is driven via a plunger shaft (10) is arranged to move axially, and optionally a hollow-cylinder damping plunger (11).Using different embodiments, an end-position damping is carried out on one or both sides.Plunger shaft (10), plunger (4) and damping plunger (11) can be designed in a hollow-cylinder form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2013.01); F15B 15/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849451A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707639 U1 19970821; EP 1002198 A1 20000524; EP 1002198 B1 20030312; JP 2001522439 A 20011113; US 6283008 B1 20010904; WO 9849451 A1 19981105; WO 9849451 A8 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2017-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807481

- Representative's name: PATENTSHIP PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807481

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110424

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110423

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110423

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110423

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807481 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991123

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE