Global Patent Index - EP 1002213 A1

EP 1002213 A1 2000-05-24 - SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING OBJECTS AGAINST SHAPED CHARGES

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING OBJECTS AGAINST SHAPED CHARGES

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ VON OBJEKTEN GEGEN GEFORMTE LADUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR PROTEGER DES OBJETS DE CHARGES FORMEES

Publication

EP 1002213 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926501 A

Priority

  • DE 19825260 A
  • EP 9903808 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825260A1] The invention relates to a system for protecting an object from shaped charges (1) which may be approaching or landing on the same. Interference bodies (16A-16G, 17A, 18A, 19A, 20A, 21, 23, 23B, 27-29, 31, 34, 35, 42, 47A, 47B, 51, 52, 60, 63, 63A, 66, 67, 72, 75, 77, 90, 95, 100, 110, 112, 130) are provided on the surface of the object being protected. The height, shape and arrangement of the interference bodies (16A-16G, 17A, 18A, 19A, 20A, 21, 23, 23B, 27-29, 31, 34, 35, 42, 47A, 47B, 51, 52, 60, 63, 63A, 66, 67, 72, 75, 77, 90, 95, 100, 110, 112, 130) are measured in such a way that at least one is able to penetrate the inner area of the hollow charge insert (4) or a so-called stand-off area (9) in order to interfere with the formation of the beam of the shaped charge (1). This significantly reduces the effect of the shaped charge (1). By penetrating the inner area or at least the lower central area of the shaped charge (1), the interference body (16A-16G, 17A, 18A, 19A, 20A, 21, 23, 23B, 27-29, 31, 34, 35, 42, 47A, 47B, 51, 52, 60, 63, 63A, 66, 67, 72, 75, 77, 90, 95, 100, 110, 112, 130) can interfere with the beam of the shaped charge at the start of its extension and before it is complete in a particularly advantageous way, so that the final ballistic capacity of the formed charge (1) is reduced to a fraction of what it would have been.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/02; F41H 5/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/007 (2006.01); F41H 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/007 (2013.01); F41H 5/02 (2013.01); F41H 5/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964811A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825260 A1 19991216; DE 19825260 B4 20070208; AT 326678 T 20060615; AU 4372999 A 19991230; CA 2300272 A1 19991216; CA 2300272 C 20040622; DK 1002213 T3 20060911; EP 1002213 A1 20000524; EP 1002213 B1 20060517; ES 2264260 T3 20061216; IL 134375 A 20040927; IL 134375 D0 20010430; PT 1002213 E 20060929; TR 200000811 T1 20001023; US 6311605 B1 20011106; WO 9964811 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-23 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: GEKE SCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: GEKE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151111

2015-10-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GEKE SCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150922

2015-07-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GEKE SCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20150714

2015-07-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150618 AND 20150624

2015-06-18 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEKE SCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150612

2015-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP WENGER RYFFEL AG, CH

2015-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEKE SCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEKE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH, DE

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GEKE SCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 326678 T

- Effective date: 20140414

2008-09-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GEKE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

- Free text: GEKE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH#ERASMUSSTR. 16#79098 FREIBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GEKE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH#ERASMUSSTR. 16#79098 FREIBURG (DE)

2008-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20071028

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060818

2008-04-25 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2008-03-14 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2008-03-12 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20071028

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RUAG LAND SYSTEMS

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2007-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RUAG LAND SYSTEMS

- Effective date: 20070211

2007-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

- Effective date: 20070214

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264260 T3

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403810

2006-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2006-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-09-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040914

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEKE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE