Global Patent Index - EP 1002215 A1

EP 1002215 A1 2000-05-24 - AIR BAG CONNECTOR

Title (en)

AIR BAG CONNECTOR

Title (de)

AIRBAG-STECKVERBINDER

Title (fr)

RACCORD POUR AIRBAG

Publication

EP 1002215 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940822 A

Priority

  • JP 22724697 A
  • US 9816508 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908062A1] An igniter connector provides for an accurate positioning of electrical contacts relative to an insulating housing, thus making it possible to form a precise pin-and-socket connection between pin terminals of an igniter and the electrical contacts. The igniter connector (1) comprises an insulating housing (10), a ferrite bead (30) is inserted in a bead-receiving cavity (12) of the insulating housing (10), electrical contacts (41, 42) are arranged in contact-receiving cavities (13a, 13b) formed by a partition (14) located in the insulating housing (10) and the ferrite bead (30) placed in the bead-receiving cavity (12), and a cover member (50) enclosing the bead-receiving cavity (12). The cover member (50) has alignment posts (54, 55) fitting in receptacle sections (44) of the electrical contacts (41, 42), the purpose of which is to precisely align the receptable sections (44) with holes (22, 23) in housing (10) through which pin terminals are inserted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/10; H01R 13/639

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/188 (2006.01); F42C 19/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/719 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/188 (2013.01); F42C 19/06 (2013.01); H01R 13/719 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908062A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908062 A1 19990218; AU 8901298 A 19990301; DE 69802289 D1 20011206; DE 69802289 T2 20020627; EP 1002215 A1 20000524; EP 1002215 B1 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100807

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802289 20011206

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT