Global patent index - EP 1002285 A4

EP 1002285 A4 2000-11-15 - INTERNET TRANSACTION PROCESSING INTERFACE

Title (en)

INTERNET TRANSACTION PROCESSING INTERFACE

Title (de)

INTERNET-TRANSAKTONSVERARBEITUNGSINTERFACE

Title (fr)

INTERFACE DE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTION INTERNET

Publication

EP 1002285 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98937896 A

Priority

  • NZ 9800121 W
  • NZ 32853897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908208A1] An Internet transaction process interface for software applications residing in an object oriented client server environment which dynamically generates HTML code. Internet user requests are passed from a web server to the object oriented environment. User session management, manages and maintains web connected users via use of use TCP/IP address lists, unique session IDs and their corresponding session objects. Each session object calls upon pre-stored application forms which includes menus, controls and implicitly assigned data from the user requests. The controls are executed via a method and the output returned to the form, this is then converted to corresponding HTML strings and passed back to the web browser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30893 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01); H04L 67/142 (2013.01); H04L 69/32 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9642041 A2 19961227 - OPEN MARKET INC [US]
  • [A] DOSSICK S E ET AL: "WWW access to legacy client/server applications", FIFTH INTERNATIONAL WORLD WIDE WEB CONFERENCE, PARIS, FRANCE, 6-10 MAY 1996, vol. 28, no. 7-11, Computer Networks and ISDN Systems, May 1996, Elsevier, Netherlands, pages 931 - 940, XP004018197, ISSN: 0169-7552
  • [A] RENNHACKKAMP M: "Unlocking the mainframe legacy database accessibility from Web browsers", DBMS, JUNE 1997, MILLER FREEMAN, USA, vol. 10, no. 7, pages 54 - 56, 58 - 59, XP002147019, ISSN: 1041-5173, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.dbmsmag.com/9706d14.html> [retrieved on 20000908]
  • [A] TIBBETTS J ET AL: "Legacy applications on the Web", AMERICAN PROGRAMMER, DEC. 1996, CUTTER INF. CORP, USA, vol. 9, no. 12, pages 18 - 24, XP002092254, ISSN: 1048-5600
  • See also references of WO 9908208A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908208 A1 19990218; AU 743497 B2 20020124; AU 8654098 A 19990301; EP 1002285 A1 20000524; EP 1002285 A4 20001115

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE