Global patent index - EP 1002300 A1

EP 1002300 A1 2000-05-24 - SECURITY ELEMENT STRUCTURE FOR DOCUMENTS, DEVICES FOR CONTROLLING DOCUMENTS COMPRISING SUCH SECURITY ELEMENTS, AND METHOD FOR USING SAID SECURITY ELEMENTS AND DEVICES

Title (en)

SECURITY ELEMENT STRUCTURE FOR DOCUMENTS, DEVICES FOR CONTROLLING DOCUMENTS COMPRISING SUCH SECURITY ELEMENTS, AND METHOD FOR USING SAID SECURITY ELEMENTS AND DEVICES

Title (de)

AUFBAU VON SICHERHEITSELEMENTEN FÜR DOKUMENTE UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR PRÜFUNG VON DOKUMENTEN MIT DERARTIGEN SICHERHEITSELEMENTEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESER SICHERHEITSELEMENTE UND VORRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE D'ELEMENTS DE SECURITE POUR DOCUMENTS, DISPOSITIFS POUR LE CONTROLE DE DOCUMENTS COMPORTANT DE TELS ELEMENTS DE SECURITE, ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CES ELEMENTS DE SECURITE ET DISPOSITIFS

Publication

EP 1002300 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932024 A

Priority

  • DE 9801180 W
  • DE 19734855 A
  • DE 19812811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909528A1] The invention concerns the security element structure for documents, devices for controlling documents comprising such security elements, and a method for using said security elements and devices as per the patent application DE 197 34 855.6. The invention aims at completing the security element structure for documents, and at proposing devices for controlling such security elements, an a novel method for using these security elements and devices, making it very difficult, if not impossible, for forgers to discover how the methods and devices work, as far as the security elements are concerned, and subsequently produce forged documents so identical to the original documents as to make them undetectable by the control devices. The security element structure for documents to be controlled corresponds to the new design which is not based primarily on visual observation but on control methods. Said design referred to below as functional design, results from the combination of electrically conducting and insulating structures of identical or different sizes, in identical or different planes, with identical or different conductivity, and it is materialised by metal-coated structures and/or writing or printing electrically conductive inks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); G02B 5/18 (2006.01); G07D 7/02 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/0013 (2013.01); G07D 7/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909528A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909528 A1 19990225; AT 213353 T 20020215; AU 8208398 A 19990308; BG 104142 A 20000630; BR 9811149 A 20000725; CA 2306924 A1 19990225; CN 1267383 A 20000920; CZ 20000395 A3 20000614; CZ 289274 B6 20011212; DE 19812811 A1 19990923; DK 1002300 T3 20020617; EP 1002300 A1 20000524; EP 1002300 B1 20020213; ES 2172900 T3 20021001; HU 0003759 A2 20010228; HU 0003759 A3 20021128; JP 2001516092 A 20010925; JP 3741954 B2 20060201; NO 20000616 A 20000407; NO 20000616 D0 20000208; PL 187653 B1 20040831; PL 340874 A1 20010312; PT 1002300 E 20020731; SK 1932000 A3 20001211; TR 200000652 T2 20010921

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20070903

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-10-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20070903

2007-10-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20070903

2007-10-22 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021016

2007-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-12-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WHD ELEKTRONISCHE PRUFTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-04-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-02-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2002-12-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172900

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020402049

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-06-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-05-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020511

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-26 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020426

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 213353

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE