Global Patent Index - EP 1002307 A1

EP 1002307 A1 2000-05-24 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING SENSOR OUTPUT SIGNALS BETWEEN SENSORS WORKING IN ASYNCHRONOUS MODE AND THEIR RESPECTIVE DATA PROCESSING UNITS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING SENSOR OUTPUT SIGNALS BETWEEN SENSORS WORKING IN ASYNCHRONOUS MODE AND THEIR RESPECTIVE DATA PROCESSING UNITS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON SENSORAUSGANGSSIGNALEN ZWISCHEN ASYNCHRON ARBEITENDEN SENSOREN UND IHREN JEWEILIGEN DATENVERARBEITUNGSEINHEITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSMETTRE DES SIGNAUX DE SORTIE DE DETECTEURS ENTRE DES DETECTEURS FONCTIONNANT EN MODE ASYNCHRONE ET LEUR UNITE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1002307 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938710 A

Priority

  • DE 19734248 A
  • EP 9804722 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734248A1] The invention relates to a method and corresponding circuit for pulse redistribution of pwm sensor output data (pi), for example from inertial sensors. The method is characterized in that the scanning interval (s2) of a data processing device, which processes the output signals of one or more sensors, is independent of the length and of the phase position of the limit cycle (s1) or limit cycles (s1) of the sensor(s). In addition, a range transfer of sensors having different working ranges is possible, irrespective of the scanning interval of the data processing device. As a result, incorrect sensor output data can be easily recognized.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908248A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734248 A1 19990211; DE 19734248 B4 20040422; EP 1002307 A1 20000524; EP 1002307 B1 20021127; ES 2186198 T3 20030501; WO 9908248 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186198 T3

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806460 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT