Global Patent Index - EP 1002325 A1

EP 1002325 A1 2000-05-24 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING SWITCHGEAR-RELATED DATA IN SWITCHGEAR CONTACTS AND/OR OPERATION-RELATED DATA IN A CONNECTED NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING SWITCHGEAR-RELATED DATA IN SWITCHGEAR CONTACTS AND/OR OPERATION-RELATED DATA IN A CONNECTED NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON SCHALTGERÄTESPEZIFISCHEN DATEN AN KONTAKTEN IN SCHALTGERÄTEN UND/ODER VON BETRIEBSSPEZIFISCHEN DATEN IM DAMIT GESCHALTETEN NETZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER DES DONNEES SPECIFIQUES D'APPAREILS DE COMMUTATION AU NIVEAU DE CONTACTS INSTALLES DANS LESDITS APPAREILS DE COMMUTATION ET/OU DONNEES SPECIFIQUES DE FONCTIONNEMENT DANS UN RESEAU COMMUTE DE FA ON CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1002325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948727 A

Priority

  • DE 9802247 W
  • DE 19734224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734224C1] The invention relates to a method in which the contact spring action at the break is detected, in particular for earthing contacts, as a replacement criterion for the erosion of contacts. Erosion can be determined by measuring the change in contact spring action during the switching off process, and converted to give the residual life of the contacts. This requires precise measurement of the armature path from the beginning of the armature movement to the beginning of the contact opening. In accordance with the invention, the switching conditions in the switchgear and in the electric network can also be detected from the signals used for determining the contact spring action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/0015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908301A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734224 C1 19990204; CN 1138288 C 20040211; CN 1267392 A 20000920; EP 1002325 A1 20000524; EP 1002325 B1 20020320; US 6313636 B1 20011106; WO 9908301 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803443

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803443

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT