Global Patent Index - EP 1002346 A1

EP 1002346 A1 2000-05-24 - HIGH CURRENT CONTACT DEVICE

Title (en)

HIGH CURRENT CONTACT DEVICE

Title (de)

HOCHSTROMKONTAKTEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTACT A COURANT FORT

Publication

EP 1002346 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946270 A

Priority

  • DE 19734306 A
  • EP 9804826 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734306C1] The invention relates to a high current contact device, especially for automobiles, comprising a cable receiving part (2) to which a cable carrying a high current can be mechanically connected with a cable guide (6), and a contact fixing part (10) for fixing to a contact point (15) located on an insulating support. The cable receiving part (2) and the contact fixing part (10)are interconnected electrically and mechanically by a contact connecting part (12). A high current contact device which is able to ensure reliable electrical contacting in spite of the vibration that it has to absorb has at least one opening (13) in the contact connecting part (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/09; B60R 16/02; H01R 4/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/28 (2006.01); H01R 4/30 (2006.01); H01R 12/51 (2011.01); H01R 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/515 (2013.01); H01R 11/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908339A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734306 C1 19990204; EP 1002346 A1 20000524; EP 1002346 B1 20011128; JP 2001512892 A 20010828; KR 20000070698 A 20001125; WO 9908339 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802258

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2004-08-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802258 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/04 A, 7H 01R 4/58 B, 7B 60R 16/02 B

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990619

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB