Global Patent Index - EP 1002359 A1

EP 1002359 A1 2000-05-24 - RELUCTANCE MOTOR, ESPECIALLY A LINEAR RELUCTANCE MOTOR

Title (en)

RELUCTANCE MOTOR, ESPECIALLY A LINEAR RELUCTANCE MOTOR

Title (de)

RELUKTANZMOTOR, INSBESONDERE LINEAR-RELUKTANZMOTOR

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A RELUCTANCE, NOTAMMENT MOTEUR A RELUCTANCE LINEAIRE

Publication

EP 1002359 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943836 A

Priority

  • DE 19733726 A
  • EP 9804853 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19733726A1] A reluctance motor has an annular stator with at least one air gap, and a rotor segment which is arranged in said air gap, parallel to the central axis of the stator, in such that it can move. According to the invention, the breadth of the air gap varies in the axial direction of the same. The inventive reluctance motor also comprises a stator winding, said stator winding being guided around the stator in such a way that when there is a constant electrical current through the stator winding, a magnetic field induced in the air gap presents a magnetic flux distribution which is dependent on the axial position of the rotor segment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 19/10; H02K 41/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 19/10 (2006.01); H02K 3/04 (2006.01); H02K 41/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 41/03 (2013.01); H02K 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908368A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733726 A1 19990211; DE 19733726 C2 20001005; EP 1002359 A1 20000524; JP 2001512958 A 20010828; WO 9908368 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080924

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061024

2005-09-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMIC AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRIC MOTORS GMBH

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL ISAD ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. OHG

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT