Global Patent Index - EP 1002441 A1

EP 1002441 A1 2000-05-24 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1002441 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924018 A

Priority

  • DE 9800794 W
  • DE 19734312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734312A1] The invention concerns a communication system comprising at least one mobile communication device having at least actuating means for triggering the operation of at least one apparatus communicating with said communication device Within an application range (10) of the communication device(s) (12), positioning markers (36, 38, 40, 42, 44) are provided and assigned to defined zones (16, 18, 20, 22, 24) which, when the communication device (12) enters one of said zones (16, 18, 20, 22, 24), communicate to said communication device (12) the current position, for switching a functional part of the actuating means (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 9/00; H04M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 9/00 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01); G08C 19/28 (2006.01); H04Q 7/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/28 (2013.01); G08C 17/02 (2013.01); G08C 2201/91 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908470A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734312 A1 19990211; AU 732990 B2 20010503; AU 7637398 A 19990301; EP 1002441 A1 20000524; EP 1002441 B1 20040811; ES 2227835 T3 20050401; JP 2001522151 A 20011113; US 6314297 B1 20011106; WO 9908470 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227835 T3

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811803 P 20040916

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE