Global Patent Index - EP 1002468 A2

EP 1002468 A2 2000-05-24 - Method and apparatus for glueing a wrapping strip for a filler from the tobacco processing industry

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for glueing a wrapping strip for a filler from the tobacco processing industry

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Beleimen eines Umhüllungsstreifens für einen Füller der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour coller une bande d'enrobage d'une tige de l'industrie de transformation du tabac

Publication

EP 1002468 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122531 A

Priority

DE 19853833 A

Abstract (en)

Filler in tobacco-processing industry has a device for gluing casing strip in order to form tobacco or filter sequence. At least one glue application device is used and a mixture device (43) adds small gas bubbles, particularly small inert gas or air bubbles to the preferably liquid glue. This causes a glue foam (41) to form, which is fed to the application device (42,42a). The strip material (27) to be glued is porous and warmed glue and gas are fed to the mixture device (43).

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben werden ein Verfahren und eine Anordnung zum Beleimen eines Umhüllungsstreifens für einen Füller der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie zwecks Bildung eines Tabak- oder Filterstranges. Das Verfahren und die Anordnung bezwecken eine Verbesserung des optischen Erscheinungsbildes von verleimten Umhüllungsstreifen, insbesondere von Umhüllungsstreifen aus porösem Material, wobei auch ein Durchtreten von Leim durch das Material zuverlässig verhindert werden soll. Die Lösung hierfür besteht darin, daß der vorzugsweise flüssige Leim mit Gasbläschen, insbesondere Inertgas- oder Luftbläschen, versetzt und anschließend als Schaum auf den Umhüllungsstreifen aufgetragen wird. Das Verfahren und die Anordnung weisen den Vorteil auf, daß der aufgebrachte Leim nicht durch das Material durchschlägt, wodurch sich ein optisch nachteiliges Bild ergäbe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/24 (2006.01); A24D 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002468 A2 20000524; EP 1002468 A3 20050309; CN 1125605 C 20031029; CN 1254536 A 20000531; DE 19853833 A1 20000525; JP 2000157247 A 20000613; PL 336649 A1 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050910

2006-01-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI