Global patent index - EP 1002472 A1

EP 1002472 A1 2000-05-24 - Snowboard-Boot with cushion surrounding the back of the foot

Title (en)

Snowboard-Boot with cushion surrounding the back of the foot

Title (de)

Snowboardstiefel mit einem sich an der Rückseite des Fusses erstreckenden Kissen

Title (fr)

Chaussure de surf avec un coussin entourant l'arrière du pied

Publication

EP 1002472 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121869 A

Priority

DE 19853276 A

Abstract (en)

A snowboard boot consists of a soft inner boot (2) and a soft outer boot (3). A cushioned section is located between the inner and outer boots above the heel (7), and extends around the back of the foot. The cushion (8) extends forward and covers both ankle joint bones.

Abstract (de)

In einem Snowboard-Softstiefel ist oberhalb des Fersenbereichs 7 zwischen dem Innenstiefel 2 und dem Außenstiefel 3 ein Kissen 8 angeordnet, das sich auf beiden Seiten des Fußes nach vorne erstreckt und beide Knöchelbereiche 10 des Fußes oben und unten umgreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/0063 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002472 A1 20000524; DE 19853276 A1 20000525; JP 2000152802 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEAD SPORT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI