Global Patent Index - EP 1002481 A1

EP 1002481 A1 2000-05-24 - Frame for a foldable half of a tennis table

Title (en)

Frame for a foldable half of a tennis table

Title (de)

Gestell für klappbare Tischtennistischhälfte

Title (fr)

Bâti pour une moitié de table de tennis pliable

Publication

EP 1002481 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122447 A

Priority

DE 19853328 A

Abstract (en)

The table tennis table half has a frame which enables it to be pivoted from a horizontal playing position into an approximately vertical transport position and vice versa. It has table legs (4) fixed on pivot bearings in the vicinity of the table top, to which rollers are connected. A foot part (1) with rollers (2) is fitted to two table legs. The foot part is fixed to the table leg pivotably around a vertical axis and is provided with a fixture part (3), with which the foot part can be fixed in selectable positions. The foot part and table leg are secured by a screw (5) and wing nut (6).

Abstract (de)

Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, ein Gestell für einen Tischtennistisch anzugeben, das in der Spiel- und in der Transportstellung des Tisches eine hohe Standsicherheit gewährleistet und das ein Abstellen der Tischhälfte mit geringen Platzbedarf ermöglicht. Erfindungsgemäß gelingt die Lösung der Aufgabe dadurch, daß an zwei Tischbeinen je ein Fußteil mit Rollen angebracht ist, daß das Fußteil am Tischbein schwenkbar um eine senkrechte Achse befestigt ist und mit einer Feststelleinrichtung versehen ist, mit der das Fußteil in wählbaren Stellungen fixiert werden kann. Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gestell für eine klappbare und transportable Tischtennistischhälfte, die von der waagerechten Spielstellung in eine etwa senkrechte Transportstellung und umgekehrt geschwenkt werden kann, mit in der Nähe der Tischplatte an Schwenklagerungen befestigten Tischbeinen, an denen sich Rollen befinden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 25/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 3799073 A 19740326 - NIELSEN O

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002481 A1 20000524; DE 19853328 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020917

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI