Global Patent Index - EP 1002485 A1

EP 1002485 A1 2000-05-24 - Folding seat

Title (en)

Folding seat

Title (de)

Klappsitz

Title (fr)

Siège pliant

Publication

EP 1002485 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420227 A

Priority

FR 9814585 A

Abstract (en)

The chair includes a base comprising two front (6A) and rear tubular parts. Two tubes (8) of the front part are articulated on two rear tubes of the rear part. The seat also has a seat part (16) articulated on the two front tubes about a front axis (A). The seat is provided with a rigidifying crosspiece (22) which extends between the front tubes and is free to pivot relative to the front tubes. The crosspiece is articulated on the seat part.

Abstract (fr)

Ce siège comprend un piétement comportant deux parties tubulaires avant (6A) et arrière, deux tubes avant (8) de la partie avant (6A) étant articulés sur deux tubes arrière de la partie arrière, ledit siège comprenant également une assise (16) articulée sur les deux tubes avant (8), autour d'un axe d'articulation avant (A), ledit siège (2) étant pourvu d'une traverse de rigidification (22) s'étendant entre les tubes avant (8) et libre de pivoter par rapport aux tubes avant (8). La traverse de rigidification (22) est articulée sur l'assise (16), autour d'un axe (A) contenu sensiblement dans le plan de l'assise (16). On peut ainsi conférer une forme cintrée à la traverse, ce qui est avantageux pour le confort d'un utilisateur, sans que cette traverse ne soit gênante pour le stockage du siège, puisqu'elle est escamotable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 5/06; A47C 4/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/30 (2006.01); A47C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/30 (2013.01); A47C 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002485 A1 20000524; FR 2785779 A1 20000519; FR 2785779 B1 20010209

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021031

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI